EP0973430 - ENDOSCOPE WITH LENGTH CORRECTION DURING THERMAL STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDISCHHAUSER, Jürgen Egerstrasse 24 D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
RENNER, Klaus Heudorfer Strasse 10 D-78576 Liptingen / DE | 03 /
HÖFIG, Siegfried Scheffelstrasse 26 D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Weller, Wolfgang, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Weller, Wolfgang, Dr., et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98921403.6 | 27.03.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP01826 | Priority number, date | DE1997113275 | 29.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19713275 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843529 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973430 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973430 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61B1/042 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (EP,US);
A61B1/00195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/04] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP MIT LÄNGENAUSGLEICH BEI THERMISCHER BELASTUNG | [2000/04] | English: | ENDOSCOPE WITH LENGTH CORRECTION DURING THERMAL STRESS | [2000/04] | French: | ENDOSCOPE AVEC COMPENSATION DE LONGUEUR EN CAS DE CHARGE THERMIQUE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 28.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2005
21.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henke-Sass Wolf GmbH Kronenstrasse 16 78532 Tuttlingen / DE Opponent's representative Grimm, Christian Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2005
21.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henke-Sass Wolf GmbH Kronenstrasse 16 78532 Tuttlingen / DE Opponent's representative Grimm, Christian Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | 20.05.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/33] | 17.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.03.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9605764 (IMAGYN MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 31 * * page 15, line 3 - page 16, line 4; figures 1,4,10,11 * [A] 2,3; | [A]DE3708124 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 67 - column 7, line 51; figure 1 * |