EP1009317 - SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING A CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE FIBER AND METHODS OF FORMING AND INSERTING THE FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION One Boston Scientific Place Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCRORY, Jennifer 655 South Fairoaks Avenue I-211 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
LÜSCHER, Patrik Steinwiesstrasse 7 CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH | 03 /
KAMATH, Kalpana 20 Silver Hill Lane Natick, MA 01760 / US | 04 /
SAHATJIAN, Ronald 29 Saddle Club Road Lexington, MA 01760 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2002/01] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | ||
Former [2000/25] | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940984.2 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US17143 | Priority number, date | US19970919107 | 28.08.1997 Original published format: US 919107 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911191 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009317 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61B17/12 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/12131 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B17/12036 (EP,US);
A61B17/12186 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00495 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2000/25] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR IMPLANTATION EINER VERNETZTEN POLYSACCHARIDFASER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN FORMUNG UND EINFÜHRUNG | [2000/25] | English: | SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING A CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE FIBER AND METHODS OF FORMING AND INSERTING THE FIBER | [2000/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMPLANTATION D'UNE FIBRE DE POLYSACCHARIDE RETICULEE ET PROCEDES DE FORMATION ET D'INSERTION DE CETTE FIBRE | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9604954 (ETH ZUERICH [CH], et al) [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11,15,16; | [YA]EP0424068 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [Y] 1,4-11 * abstract * [A] 12,15; | [YA]WO9508291 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [Y] 2,3,15,16 * abstract * [A] 1,9,12 | International search | [A]US5443454 (TANABE SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [A]US4159022 (PEVSNER PAUL H [US]); | [A]US4994069 (RITCHART MARK [US], et al); | [A]US5021059 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al) |