EP1019743 - BATTERY CAPACITY MEASUREMENT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hospira, Inc. 275 North Field Drive Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US | [2004/36] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNY, David 1703 Prudence Way San Jose, CA 95116 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Gene, E. 3714 Red Oak Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
HSU, Rupert 4974 Mise Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 04 /
MASKE, Rudolph, J. 6770 Olive Branch Court San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948594.1 | 30.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US20492 | Priority number, date | US19970948137 | 09.10.1997 Original published format: US 948137 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9919737 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1019743 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019743 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/3648 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,US);
Y10S320/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | BATTERIEKAPAZITÄTSMESSANORDNUNG | [2007/46] | English: | BATTERY CAPACITY MEASUREMENT CIRCUIT | [2000/29] | French: | CIRCUIT DE MESURE DE LA CAPACITE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR | [2000/29] |
Former [2000/29] | BATTERIEKAPAZITÄTMESSANORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08154156.7 / EP2079149 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | IE | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | LU | 30.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2121971 (LUCAS IND PLC) [X] 1,2,12,13 * see abstract; page 2, line 83 - line 123; figure 1 * [Y] 2-6,8-13; | [A]WO9516200 (CURTIS INSTR [US]) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]US5527630 (NAGATA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [Y]US5640150 (ATWATER TERRILL B [US]) [Y] 2-6,8-13 * figures 1,2 *; | [L]US5841284 (TAKAHASHI SUSUMU [JP]) [L] 1-18 * cited for language reasons &JP08136628(fujitsu)31 May 1996;; figure 1; claim 1 * |