EP0972684 - Locking mechanism for a safety belt retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kielwein, Thomas Batschenhofer Strasse 36 73569 Eschach / DE | 02 /
Rink, Jürgen Gmünder Strasse 55 73550 Waldstetten / DE | 03 /
Schmid, Johannes Hauptstrasse 124 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113519.5 | 05.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | DE1998212435U | 13.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29812435 U | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972684 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972684 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/405 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B60R22/405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/40] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sperrmechanismus für einen Sicherheitsgurtaufroller | [2000/03] | English: | Locking mechanism for a safety belt retractor | [2000/03] | French: | Mécanisme de blocage pour un enrouleur de ceinture de sécurité | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 20.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.12.2003 | [2004/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2751362 (TAKATA KOJYO CO) [A] 1,5 * page 9, line 7 - page 12, paragraph L; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE2722744 (HILDEBRANDT ECKHARD DR ING) [A] 1* page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4858847 (OGRIS GOTTFRIED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5071194 (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 3-32; figure 1 * |