EP0937868 - Oil filter fixing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | For all designated states Tennex Corporation 13-5, Minami-ikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | ||
For all designated states Tennex Corporation 13-5, Minami-ikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arita, Eriya 205-6, Fujikubo, Miyoshi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiya, Kunihiko 1-12, Senzui 2-chome Asaka city, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Katsuya 845-1, Ohaza-koshikiya Ageo city, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Yamamura, Hideki 692-19, Ohaza-kosamurai Taku city, Saga / JP | 05 /
Matsunaga, Takeshi 59-23-B503, Hijiriyama 1-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99301156.8 | 17.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | JP19980039170 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3917098 | JP19980369857 | 25.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36985798 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937868 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937868 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/03 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
F01M11/03 (EP,US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D29/96 (EP,US);
B01D35/147 (EP,US);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/18] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ölfilterbefestigungstruktur | [1999/34] | English: | Oil filter fixing structure | [1999/34] | French: | Support pour le montage d'un filtre à huile | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2309397 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 10; figure - *; | [A]US5698098 (ERNST VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 10; figure - *; | [A]EP0681094 (FRAM EUROP [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 3; figure - *; | [AP]EP0861682 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1 * abstract *; | [AP]EP0839563 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [AP] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPH09173716 | by applicant | JPH09173716 |