EP0972507 - Lid foil with conductor tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse Technology & Management AG 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Styger, Christian Lahmerstrasse 4 8247 Flurlingen / CH | 02 /
Lüthi, Markus Maiegass 10 8460 Marthalen / CH | 03 /
Linsi, Thomas Hornbergstrasse 4 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 04 /
Lohwasser, Wolfgang Friedhofstrasse 4 78262 Gailingen / DE | [2000/03] | Application number, filing date | 99810435.0 | 19.05.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | CH19980001181 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: CH 118198 | [2000/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972507 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/04 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A61J7/0481 (EP);
A61J1/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Deckelfolie mit Leiterbahnen | [2000/03] | English: | Lid foil with conductor tracks | [2000/03] | French: | Feuille de fermeture avec pistes conductrices | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/16] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.09.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0796605 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0129785 (SIMON UDO) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5313439 (ALBECK DAN [IL]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 55 - column 8, line 10; figures 2A-4B *; | [A]US4616316 (HANPETER JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP0129785 | EP0796605 |