EP0993365 - METHOD OF MOLDING CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester New York 14604-2701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCIO, Dominic, V. 487 Joseph Circle Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908605.1 | 01.03.1999 | [2000/16] | WO1999US04493 | Priority number, date | US19980078300P | 17.03.1998 Original published format: US 78300 P | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9947344 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993365 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993365 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B29D11/00125 (EP);
B29D11/00 (KR);
B29K2105/0085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GIESSEN VON KONTAKTLINSEN | [2000/16] | English: | METHOD OF MOLDING CONTACT LENSES | [2000/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE MOULAGE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2004/03] | ES | 08.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9407684 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO9746617 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 16 - line 22 * * page 3, line 20 - line 24 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 7 * * page 8, line 25 - line 30; claims 1,3-6 *; | [A]EP0451858 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * * page 1, line 44 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 25 - line 50 *; | [A]US4208364 (SHEPHERD THOMAS H [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 38 * * column 8, line 13 - line 31 * |