Hilfe



Globale Akte

Leider ist diese Seite derzeit nicht in deutscher Sprache verfügbar.


The Global Dossier service provides single-point access to dossier content of patent documents from numerous intellectual property offices, including the IP5 offices. The file content and their translations are made available to the EPO from the partner offices of the Global Dossier.

Each partner office offers real-time access to the relevant data on their servers. However, it may take up to eight weeks from their national publication date before documents are available in the Global Dossier.

The offices supporting the Global Dossier service are listed below, together with brief details of the content available.


  • Canadian Intellectual Property Office (CIPO): applications published on or after 1 October 2015

  • Intellectual Property Office of the People's Republic of China (SIPO): applications with a national filing date on or after 10 February 2010

  • European Patent Office (EPO): applications with a filing date on or after 1 June 1978

  • Japan Patent Office (JPO): patent and utility model applications with a national filing date on or after 1 January 1991

  • Korean Intellectual Property Office (KIPO): patent and utility model applications with a national filing date on or after 1 January 2000

  • United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO): applications with national filing date on or after 1 January 2003 (some earlier applications may also be available).

  • World Intellectual Property Office (WIPO): applications published on or after 1 January 1978


To access the dossier content of a patent document, click on the Global Dossier link next to the patent document number in the header. The link is only displayed when dossier content is available.


Monitoring changes to dossier content with RSS

An RSS feed is implemented on the Global Dossier webpage so that you can follow changes to the dossier content of a particular patent document.

To subscribe to the feed, click on the RSS: dossier link located next to the document number in the header, and follow the instructions on the RSS reader webpage.

It is possible to set up an RSS feed inbox for your email account. Consult your email provider for instructions.

You can also monitor more than one dossier of patent family members that support the Global Dossier service in the Patent family panel. To activate the RSS feed, click on the RSS: family dossiers located in the header panel.


Note: The RSS feed service is currently available for the dossier content of the EPO and SIPO.


Related topics



Disclaimer

The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy or quality of the data displayed, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.