News flashes

Monaco joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

31.07.2017

Global Dossier - individual and patent family member RSS feeds now available for patent monitoring

For more information please consult the release notes .

19.06.2017

Bulgaria joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

04.05.2017

Poland joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

09.02.2017

New: Extension of the Global Dossier service

The Global Dossier service has now been extended. Click here for more information.

15.11.2016

New version of the European Patent Register

A new version of the European Patent Register is available. For more information please consult the release notes.

07.11.2016

Spain joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

05.09.2016

Lithuania joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

05.07.2016

Croatia joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

21.06.2016

The Netherlands and the Former Yugoslav Republic of Macedonia join the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

10.05.2016

Greece joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

18.03.2016