Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

The incorrect indication of older events appearing now as the most recent event could lead to confusion and the EPO has worked as fast as possible to correct the issue. However, additional corrections might still be necessary.

The incorrect information only affects the “Most recent event” indication and “Event history”. The European Patent Register still indicates the correct patent status for these applications.

We apologise for any inconvenience this may have caused.

Should you require more information please contact support@epo.org .

2019.04.15

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2019.03.18

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Sunday, 17.03.2019, 09.00 hrs - 19.00 hrs CET

2019.03.14

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2019.01.21

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Saturday, 19.01.2019, 07.00 hrs - 14.30 hrs CET

2019.01.16

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.12.31

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Thursday, 27.12.2018, 12.00 hrs - Monday, 31.12.2018, 08.00 hrs CET

2018.12.18

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.10.30

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Monday, 29.10.2018, 19.00 - 23.00 hrs CET

2018.10.29

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.10.29

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Sunday, 28.10.2018, 02.00 – 06.00 hrs CET

2018.10.24

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.10.08

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Sunday, 07.10.2018, 08.00 – 12.00 hrs CET

2018.10.05

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.07.30

Scheduled maintenance

Outages:
Sunday, 29.07.2018, 05.00 – 09.00 hrs CET

2018.07.23

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.04.16

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 15.04.2018 08.00 – 12.00 hrs CET

2018.04.13

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

2018.01.29

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 28.01.2018 05.30 – 07.30 hrs CET

2018.01.24

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

02.11.2017

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 29.10.2017 03.00 – 05.00 hrs CET

29.10.2017

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

28.08.2017

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 27.08.2017 05.00 – 07.00 hrs CET

25.08.2017

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).

20.07.2017

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 16.07.2017 05.00 – 07.00 hrs CET

12.07.2017

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 25.06.2017 05.30 – 07.30 hrs CET.

20.06.2017

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Su. 21.05.2017 05.00 – 08.00 hrs CET.

11.05.2017

Scheduled maintenance

Owing to technical maintenance work online services of the EPO will be temporarily unavailable on:
Sunday October 30th 2016 from 02.00hrs CET until 04.00 CET;
Monday October 31th 2016 from 18.30hrs CET until 18.45 CET.
We apologise for any inconvenience.

28.10.2016

Scheduled maintenance

Owing to technical maintenance work online services of the EPO will be temporarily unavailable on
Sunday, 4 September 2016, between at least 05.30 and 09.30 CET. We apologise for any inconvenience

31.08.2016

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Sun 29th of May 05.30 - 07.30 hrs CET

25.05.2016

EP Register outages

Sun 29th of May 05.30 - 07.30 hrs CET

25.05.2016

EP Register outages

Sat 21.05.2016 09.00 – 09.30 hrs CET

19.05.2016

EP Register outages

Sunday 20th March 2016; 10.00 – 18.00hrs CET

14.03.2016

Scheduled maintenance

Mon-Sat 05.00 - 05.15 hrs CET; Sun: 05.00 - 06.00 hrs CET.

01.01.2016