Owing to technical maintenance work the following online services of the EPO will have irregular behaviour on Tuesday 16 November 2021, Thursday 18 November 2021, Tuesday 23 November 2021 and Thursday 25 November 2021 between 20.00 and 21.00 hrs CET: Classic Espacenet, European Patent Register, Open Patent Services, IP5 Dossier Access Service, One Portal Dossier, Third-party observations.
2021.11.17
Regular maintenance outages: between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).
2021.10.04
Outages: Saturday, 02.10.2021, 08.00 hrs - 18.00 hrs CET
2021.09.29
Owing to technical maintenance work the following online services of the EPO will be temporarily unavailable or with irregular behavior on Wednesday, 04 August 2021 between 20:00 and 23:00 hrs CET:
· European Patent Register
· Third-party observations
· IP5 Dossier access
We apologise for any inconvenience.
2021.08.04
Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).
2021.05.03
Outages:
Saturday, 01.05.2021, 08.00 hrs - 18.00 hrs CET
2020.09.24
Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).
2020.09.24
Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2020.09.07
Outages:
Sunday, 06.09.2020, 05.00 hrs - 09.00 hrs CET
2020.09.03
Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2019.10.28
Outages:
Sunday, 27.10.2019, 02.00 hrs - 06.00 hrs CET
2019.10.24
Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding
(previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some
existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is
revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.
2019.04.15
Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding
(previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some
existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is
revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.
The incorrect
indication of older events appearing now as the most
recent event
could lead to confusion and the EPO has worked as fast
as possible to
correct the issue. However, additional corrections
might still be
necessary.
The incorrect information only affects the “Most
recent event”
indication and “Event history”. The European Patent
Register still
indicates the correct patent status for these
applications.
We apologise for any inconvenience this may have
caused.
Should you require more information please contact
[email protected]
.
2019.04.15
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2019.03.18
Outages:
Sunday,
17.03.2019, 09.00 hrs - 19.00 hrs CET
2019.03.14
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2019.01.21
Outages:
Saturday,
19.01.2019, 07.00 hrs - 14.30 hrs CET
2019.01.16
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.12.31
Outages:
Thursday,
27.12.2018, 12.00 hrs - Monday, 31.12.2018, 08.00 hrs CET
2018.12.18
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.10.30
Outages:
Monday,
29.10.2018, 19.00 - 23.00 hrs CET
2018.10.29
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.10.29
Outages:
Sunday,
28.10.2018, 02.00 – 06.00 hrs CET
2018.10.24
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.10.08
Outages:
Sunday,
07.10.2018, 08.00 – 12.00 hrs CET
2018.10.05
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.07.30
Outages:
Sunday,
29.07.2018, 05.00 – 09.00 hrs CET
2018.07.23
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.04.16
EP Register
outages:
Su. 15.04.2018 08.00 – 12.00 hrs CET
2018.04.13
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
2018.01.29
EP Register
outages:
Su. 28.01.2018 05.30 – 07.30 hrs CET
2018.01.24
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
02.11.2017
EP Register
outages:
Su. 29.10.2017 03.00 – 05.00 hrs CET
29.10.2017
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
28.08.2017
EP Register
outages:
Su. 27.08.2017 05.00 – 07.00 hrs CET
25.08.2017
Regular maintenance
outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Saturday).
20.07.2017
EP Register
outages:
Su. 16.07.2017 05.00 – 07.00 hrs CET
12.07.2017
EP Register
outages:
Su. 25.06.2017 05.30 – 07.30 hrs CET.
20.06.2017
EP Register
outages:
Su. 21.05.2017 05.00 – 08.00 hrs CET.
11.05.2017
Owing to technical
maintenance work online services of the EPO will be
temporarily
unavailable on:
Sunday October 30th 2016 from 02.00hrs CET
until 04.00 CET;
Monday October 31th 2016 from 18.30hrs CET
until 18.45 CET.
We apologise for any inconvenience.
28.10.2016
Owing to technical
maintenance work online services of the EPO will be
temporarily
unavailable on
Sunday, 4 September 2016, between at least
05.30 and 09.30 CET. We apologise
for any inconvenience
31.08.2016
EP Register
outages:
Sun 29th of May 05.30 - 07.30 hrs CET
25.05.2016
Sun 29th of May 05.30 - 07.30 hrs CET
25.05.2016
Sat 21.05.2016 09.00 – 09.30 hrs CET
19.05.2016
Sunday 20th March 2016; 10.00 – 18.00hrs CET
14.03.2016
Mon-Sat 05.00 - 05.15 hrs CET; Sun: 05.00 - 06.00 hrs CET.
01.01.2016