11.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
24.11.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
09.02.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
09.02.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
09.02.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
20.04.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
10.05.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
14.09.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
26.10.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
03.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
05.11.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
05.11.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
14.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
04.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
24.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.09.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
17.08.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |