Benannte Vertragsstaaten | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | NL | | Prüfungsverfahren | 27.03.2003 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 08.12.2000 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 08.12.2000 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 08.12.2000 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 14.05.2002 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 13.05.2003 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 16.07.2003 | Einspruchsverfahren | 19.04.2004 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 07.07.2004 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT NL | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.09.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.12.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | HEAT DETECTOR WITH A LIMITED ANGLE OF VIEW | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.09.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | MISCELLANEOUS (ADDITIONAL REMARKS) | Free Format Text: | DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20001208 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.07.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | MISCELLANEOUS (ADDITIONAL REMARKS) | Free Format Text: | DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.07.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT NL | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60003885 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030821 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.07.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | FRENCH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20031024 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | Effective DATE: | 20030716 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.02.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040419 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.04.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.04.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20180508 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20180522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20180501 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20180514 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20180507 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.12.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 60003885 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.01.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20190601 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20190519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20191203 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190601 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190531 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.05.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.04.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.11.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | AVAILABILITY OF INFORMATION RELATED TO THE PUBLICATION OF THE INTERNATIONAL SEARCH REPORT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009015 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |