Benannte Vertragsstaaten | BE | | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | | IT | | Prüfungsverfahren | 21.03.2006 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 16.07.2002 | Übersetzung eingereicht | | 16.07.2002 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 16.07.2002 | Recherchengebühr entrichtet | | 16.07.2002 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 16.07.2002 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 25.11.2003 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 25.11.2004 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 30.11.2005 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 17.05.2006 | Einspruchsverfahren | 20.02.2007 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 25.04.2007 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020716 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK RO SI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7F 24F 11/02 A | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7F 25B 13/00 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7F 24F 11/00 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20040416 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20050407 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | BE DE ES FR GB IT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE ES FR GB IT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SHIMODA, JUNICHIDAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.06.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60119765 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20060622 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.01.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.04.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070220 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.12.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2262688 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.10.2015 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.10.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.10.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.11.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 60119765 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F24F0011020000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | F24F0011890000 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20060517 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20201013 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20201104 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20201210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20201013 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20201103 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.02.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20201015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.06.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.03.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60119765 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.12.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20211112 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.01.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20211113 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20211112 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.03.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.02.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20220225 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.06.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20211114 | |