Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | BE | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | BG | Erlöschen: 14.03.2006 | CH | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | CY | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | CZ | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | DE | | DK | Erlöschen: 14.03.2006 | EE | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | ES | Erlöschen: 25.03.2006 | FI | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | FR | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | GB | | GR | Erlöschen: 14.03.2006 | HU | Erlöschen: 15.06.2006 | IE | Erlöschen: 17.04.2006 | IT | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | LI | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | LU | Erlöschen: 16.04.2006 | MC | Erlöschen: 30.04.2006 | NL | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | PT | Erlöschen: 15.05.2006 | RO | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | SE | Erlöschen: 14.03.2006 | SI | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | SK | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | TR | Erlöschen: 14.12.2005 | Prüfungsverfahren | 13.10.2005 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 14.04.2005 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 14.12.2005 | Einspruchsverfahren | 15.09.2006 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 22.11.2006 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.10.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.10.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 12/64 A | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04J 3/06 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 7/08 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7H 04L 12/403 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 60R 16/02 B | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.08.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040624 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.09.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20040809 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.01.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.05.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FOREST, THOMAS M. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HEDENETZ, BERND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | RAUSCH, MATHIAS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TEMPLE, CHRISTOPHER | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EISELE, HARALD | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ELEND, BERND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | UNGERMANN, JOERN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KUEHLEWEIN, MATTHIAS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BELSCHNER, RALF | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | LOHRMANN, PETER | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BOGENBERGER, FLORIAN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WUERZ, THOMAS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MILLSAP, ARNOLD | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HEUTS, PATRICK | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUGEL, ROBERT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FUEHRER, THOMAS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MUELLER, BERND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HARTWICH, FLORIAN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ZINKE, MANFRED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BERWANGER, JOSEF | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EBNER, CHRISTIAN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WEILER, HARALD | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FUHRMANN, PETER | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SCHEDL, ANTON | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | PELLER, MARTIN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.01.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60302697 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20060119 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.01.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.06.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.06.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.07.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.11.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20060915 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.01.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.02.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060325 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.06.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060615 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.04.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060417 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.05.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.03.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060314 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070202 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060416 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.08.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.11.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.11.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101202 AND 20101208 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.08.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR EERR | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | CORRECTION DE BOPI 07/05 - 3.2. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.12.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20111125 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIEN, DAIMLER AG, FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORP., NXP B.V., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, , , NL | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.07.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP USA, INC. (N.D.GES.D.STAATES DELAWARE), AU, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE; DAIMLER AG, 70327 STUTTGART, DE; FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; GENERAL MOTORS CORP., WARREN, MI., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | Effective DATE: | 20110505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.03.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP USA, INC. (N.D.GES.D.STAATES DELAWARE), AU, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.03.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NXP B.V., NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.03.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.03.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | VOLKSWAGEN AG, DE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., AUSTIN, TEX., US; NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200319 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.12.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20051214 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.10.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.10.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.06.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.09.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.10.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 60302697 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20210416 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20211103 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210416 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.10.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |