Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | BE | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | BG | Erlöschen: 23.08.2012 | CH | | CY | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | CZ | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | DE | | DK | | EE | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | ES | Erlöschen: 03.09.2012 | FI | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | FR | | GB | | GR | Erlöschen: 24.08.2012 | HU | Erlöschen: 16.09.2003 | IE | Erlöschen: 16.09.2012 | IT | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | LI | | LU | Erlöschen: 16.09.2012 | MC | Erlöschen: 30.09.2012 | NL | | PT | Erlöschen: 24.09.2012 | RO | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | SE | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | SI | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | SK | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | TR | Erlöschen: 23.05.2012 | Prüfungsverfahren | 30.03.2012 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 21.09.2005 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 27.09.2006 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 26.09.2007 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 25.09.2008 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | 25.09.2009 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 07 | 27.09.2010 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 08 | 26.09.2011 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 09 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 23.05.2012 | Einspruchsverfahren | 26.02.2013 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 01.05.2013 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20071127 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.06.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.05.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.05.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.06.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.07.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.07.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60340998 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20120726 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.08.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | RITSCHER & PARTNER AG | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120824 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120924 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20130226 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120903 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120930 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.06.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.06.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 60340998 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20130226 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120916 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120823 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.06.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 559578 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20120615 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.11.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 559578 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.12.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | STARKEY LABS, INC., US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: STARKEY LABS, INC., US | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2014 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120523 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.05.2014 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120916 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2014 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030916 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.02.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20150926 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.09.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.05.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20161001 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20161001 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.08.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.04.2012 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.11.2011 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.09.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.01.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.03.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.02.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60340998 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20210810 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20210813 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20210816 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.03.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220809 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20220808 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.04.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20220930 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.05.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20220916 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220930 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220930 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.08.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230624 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.09.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60340998 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220930 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220916 | |