Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | BE | Erlöschen: 31.05.2019 | BG | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | CH | Erlöschen: 31.05.2019 | CY | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | CZ | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | DE | | DK | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | EE | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | ES | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | FI | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | FR | | GB | | GR | Erlöschen: 20.12.2018 | HR | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | HU | Erlöschen: 15.05.2008 | IE | Erlöschen: 15.05.2019 | IS | Erlöschen: 19.01.2019 | IT | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | LI | Erlöschen: 31.05.2019 | LT | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | LU | Erlöschen: 15.05.2019 | LV | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | MC | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | MT | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | NL | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | NO | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | PL | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | PT | Erlöschen: 19.01.2019 | RO | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | SE | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | SI | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | SK | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | TR | Erlöschen: 19.09.2018 | Prüfungsverfahren | 07.08.2018 | Eingang der Übersetzungen des Patentanspruchs/der Patentansprüche | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 01.12.2009 | Übersetzung eingereicht | | 01.12.2009 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 01.12.2009 | Recherchengebühr entrichtet | | 01.12.2009 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 01.12.2009 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 10.03.2010 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 25.05.2011 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 27.03.2012 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 24.05.2013 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | 17.03.2014 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 07 | 20.05.2015 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 08 | 30.03.2016 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 09 | 23.05.2017 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 10 | 23.05.2018 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 11 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 19.09.2018 | Einspruchsverfahren | 20.06.2019 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 28.08.2019 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.02.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20091201 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.02.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.02.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA MK RS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | OHTA, YUSUKE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WAKAHARA, SHUHEI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | NISHIKAWA, YASUSHI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.08.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.03.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KANEKA CORPORATION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/00 20060101ALI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09K 5/14 20060101ALI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/04 20060101ALI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H05K 7/20 20060101ALI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C01B 31/04 20060101AFI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01L 23/373 20060101ALI20130821BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.09.2013 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20130828 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.02.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20170104 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01L 23/373 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H05K 7/20 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/04 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 27/28 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 7/12 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C01B 32/20 20170101AFI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/00 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09K 5/14 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 5/18 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 27/06 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180105 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.06.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.07.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180620 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602008057056 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C01B0031040000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C01B0032200000 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.09.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.09.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.09.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602008057056 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1043021 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20181015 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181220 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PK | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION | Free Format Text: | BERICHTIGUNGEN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 5/18 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 27/28 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/04 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C01B 32/20 20170101AFI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01L 23/373 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09K 5/14 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 9/00 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H05K 7/20 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 7/12 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B32B 27/06 20060101ALI20171130BHEP | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.03.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 1043021 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20190119 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20190119 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.06.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602008057056 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20190620 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.12.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190531 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190531 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.02.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20190531 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.05.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190531 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.06.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION RELATED TO PAYMENT OF FEE FOR PUBLISHING/PRINTING DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.01.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.07.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.06.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.12.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20180919 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20080515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.07.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20220408 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20220401 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.12.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602008057056 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20230515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20230515 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20231201 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20230531 | |