Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AL | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | AT | | BE | | BG | Erlöschen: 19.03.2019 | CH | | CY | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | ES | | FI | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | HU | Erlöschen: 25.11.2015 | IE | | IS | Erlöschen: 19.04.2019 | IT | | LI | | LT | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | LU | | LV | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | MC | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | MK | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | MT | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | RS | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | SE | | SI | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | SK | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | SM | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | TR | Erlöschen: 19.12.2018 | Validierungsstaat(en) | MA | | MD | | Prüfungsverfahren | 05.11.2018 | Eingang der Übersetzungen des Patentanspruchs/der Patentansprüche | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 25.05.2017 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 25.05.2017 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 25.05.2017 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 21.11.2017 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 26.10.2018 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 19.12.2018 | Einspruchsverfahren | 20.09.2019 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 27.11.2019 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.10.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.10.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20170525 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.10.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.08.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180716 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.12.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.12.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.12.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602015022014 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1078309 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20190115 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.01.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.03.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20190311 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.03.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20190319 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.06.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2715504 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20190604 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.06.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20190400586 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20190509 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.08.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20190419 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.09.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602015022014 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.04.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 3224080 PT 20190402 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20190319 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.11.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20190920 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.12.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1078309 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.11.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.07.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.09.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.10.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.07.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.09.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.05.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20151125 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.10.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20181219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230529 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20231120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20231120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20231129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20231116 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20231208 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20231124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20231201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20231110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20231121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20231113 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20231117 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20231127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20231106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20231124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20231102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20231115 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.02.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20231120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.02.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20231117 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | |