Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AL | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | AT | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | BE | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | BG | Erlöschen: 16.06.2022 | CH | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | CY | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | CZ | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | DE | | DK | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | EE | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | ES | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | FI | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | FR | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | GB | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | GR | Erlöschen: 17.06.2022 | HR | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | HU | Erlöschen: 31.08.2018 | IE | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | IS | Erlöschen: 16.07.2022 | IT | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | LI | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | LT | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | LU | Erlöschen: 31.08.2022 | LV | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | MC | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | MK | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | MT | | NL | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | NO | Erlöschen: 16.06.2022 | PL | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | PT | Erlöschen: 18.07.2022 | RO | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | RS | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | SE | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | SI | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | SK | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | SM | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | TR | Erlöschen: 16.03.2022 | Validierungsstaat(en) | KH | | MA | | MD | | TN | | Prüfungsverfahren | 03.02.2022 | Eingang der Übersetzungen des Patentanspruchs/der Patentansprüche | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 24.01.2020 | Übersetzung eingereicht | | 23.02.2020 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 23.02.2020 | Recherchengebühr entrichtet | | 23.02.2020 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 23.02.2020 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 20.08.2020 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 18.08.2021 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 16.03.2022 | Einspruchsverfahren | 19.12.2022 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 22.02.2023 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20200508 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20200223 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.07.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.12.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.12.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.06.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.06.2020 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.03.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.07.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SONY GROUP CORPORATION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.10.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.10.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.11.2021 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20211015 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.02.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.02.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.02.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.03.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.03.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.04.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602018032482 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.04.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1476711 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20220415 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.04.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG9D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220616 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220616 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.07.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.08.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 1476711 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220617 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.09.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220718 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 05 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220716 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.01.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.01.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.12.2022 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602018032482 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.02.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20221219 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.04.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.04.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.04.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.04.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.05.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230528 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.09.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2023 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20220831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.03.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602018032482 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.06.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20220316 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2024 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20240301 | |