Benannte Vertragsstaaten | BE | | CH | | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IT | | LI | | LU | | NL | | SE | | Prüfungsverfahren | 15.02.1992 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 30.04.1989 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 02.04.1990 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 10.04.1991 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 22.04.1992 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 24.06.1992 | Einspruchsverfahren | 25.03.1993 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 09.06.1993 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.1992 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.06.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.09.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.12.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.10.1987 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.09.1988 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.06.1992 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.10.1987 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19870415 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1990 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19901114 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.1992 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3779946 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19920730 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.09.1992 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.11.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19970409 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.02.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR FG4A | Code Expl.: | +VALIDATION IN GREECE | Free Format Text: | 3005027 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.12.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.02.1995 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.1995 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR MM2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT OR LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Free Format Text: | 3005027 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.10.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20010910 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.03.1989 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | ELI LILLY AND CY | Effective DATE: | 19940430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.1995 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 87303082.9 | Effective DATE: | 19941110 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Effective DATE: | 19940430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Effective DATE: | 19940430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.01.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Effective DATE: | 19960103 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19940411 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 19941229 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.04.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19970409 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19941031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Effective DATE: | 19940430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19940409 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.11.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19941101 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19940410 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 19930427 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.03.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 19930325 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.03.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19940309 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 06.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 19930406 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.03.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19930305 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.03.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19960320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.02.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 19930225 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 19930407 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19930430 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.01.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19930108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.04.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050409 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.05.1992 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.07.1988 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.1987 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |