Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 16.08.1993 | BE | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | CH | Erlöschen: 31.08.1993 | DE | | ES | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | FR | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | GB | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | GR | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | IT | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | LI | Erlöschen: 31.08.1993 | LU | Erlöschen: 31.08.1993 | NL | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | SE | Erlöschen: 19.05.1993 | Prüfungsverfahren | 10.02.1993 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 11.06.1990 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 28.08.1991 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 10.06.1992 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 19.05.1993 | Einspruchsverfahren | 22.02.1994 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 04.05.1994 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.10.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.05.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.04.1989 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.08.1989 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.04.1990 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19900209 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.07.1991 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19910527 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 89483 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930615 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.06.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3881142 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930624 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.11.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.04.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.08.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19930816 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Effective DATE: | 19930831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.03.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030301 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Effective DATE: | 19930831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19930831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.09.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20010907 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRE;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED.SCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.05.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19930519 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.04.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.06.1989 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 04.03.1989 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.03.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.03.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |