Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | CH | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | DE | | DK | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | ES | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | FR | | IE | Erlöschen: 17.05.1997 | IT | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | LI | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | NL | Erlöschen: 27.12.1996 | PT | Erlöschen: 27.03.1997 | SE | Erlöschen: 27.03.1997 | Prüfungsverfahren | 26.08.1996 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 12.04.1995 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 09.05.1996 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 27.12.1996 | Einspruchsverfahren | 30.09.1997 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 17.12.1997 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.06.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.12.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.11.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT CH DE DK ES FR IE IT LI NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.07.1994 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19940513 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.10.1995 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19950907 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 146726 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19970115 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 06.02.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69306856 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19970206 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 12.02.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | 71244 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.07.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.07.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AT CH DE DK ES FR IE IT LI NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.03.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20020301 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20020131 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970517 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.03.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Effective DATE: | 19970327 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.03.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19970327 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20000515 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20000510 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRE;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED.SCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.12.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.11.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.09.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.05.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.04.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.10.1993 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.1997 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |