Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | | BE | | CH | | DE | | DK | | ES | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | SE | | Prüfungsverfahren | 10.02.2000 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Eintritt in die regionale Phase | 22.05.1996 | Nationale Grundgebühr entrichtet | | 22.05.1996 | Benennungsgebühr(en) entrichtet | | 22.05.1996 | Prüfungsgebühr entrichtet | | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 09.10.1996 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 10.10.1997 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 05.10.1998 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 04.10.1999 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 17.05.2000 | Einspruchsverfahren | 20.02.2001 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 09.05.2001 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.08.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.05.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.08.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.08.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19960522 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.04.1998 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19980218 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 192922 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20000615 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.06.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69424560 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20000621 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.08.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L. | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.10.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.11.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2149338 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20000816 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.01.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.08.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | USE OF NITRIC OXIDE RELEASING COMPOUNDS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR PROTECTION IN ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.01.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, REPRESENTED BY THE S | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.01.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20071130 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20071031 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20071026 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20071106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20071024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.02.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20071030 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.02.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20071030 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20071107 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20071029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20071017 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20071029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.05.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20071030 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.01.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20081002 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.02.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20081002 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.02.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20081003 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.06.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.06.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.05.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.07.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20090501 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.07.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.07.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20090630 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.07.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20090501 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20090501 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20071025 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.09.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.10.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.10.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.10.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.10.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.10.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.11.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20090505 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.12.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20081103 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.01.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081103 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | THE *UNITED STATES OF AMERICA REPRESENTED BY THE S | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSIT | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.07.2009 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.05.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT MM4A | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100430 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.07.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081101 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.08.2010 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091031 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 22.02.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.11.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.07.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.07.1996 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.03.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.03.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |