Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | | CH | | DE | | ES | Erlöschen: 09.03.2004 | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | | NL | Erlöschen: 26.11.2003 | Prüfungsverfahren | 11.07.2003 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 11.10.2000 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 11.10.2001 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 15.10.2002 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 31.07.2003 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 26.11.2003 | Einspruchsverfahren | 27.08.2004 | Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt | veröffentlicht am 17.11.2004 | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.04.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.12.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19991021 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.01.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.12.2001 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20011105 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SCIL TECHNOLOGY HOLDING GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.01.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59810255 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20040108 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.01.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.01.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.02.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20040126 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.04.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 03.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.08.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.11.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040827 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040309 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 26.11.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20031126 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 25.06.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH | Free Format Text: | SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FRAUNHOFERSTRASSE 15#82152 MARTINSRIED (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FRAUNHOFERSTRASSE 15#82152 MARTINSRIED (DE) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.07.2014 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCAR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH) | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.09.2015 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 19.09.2016 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.09.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.10.2017 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20170918 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.01.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20171215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20171220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20171221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20171221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.05.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20171221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.10.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 59810255 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.11.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20181012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.12.2018 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 255228 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20181013 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 28.02.2019 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20181012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 10.10.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 23.07.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.12.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.03.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.10.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.10.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |