Benannte Vertragsstaaten | AT | Erlöschen: 16.12.2004 | BE | Erlöschen: 31.12.2004 | CH | | CY | Erlöschen: 31.03.2004 | DE | | DK | Erlöschen: 30.06.2004 | ES | | FI | Erlöschen: 31.03.2004 | FR | | GB | Erlöschen: 31.03.2004 | GR | Erlöschen: 30.06.2004 | IE | Erlöschen: 31.03.2004 | IT | | LI | | LU | Erlöschen: 16.12.2004 | MC | Erlöschen: 31.12.2004 | NL | Erlöschen: 31.03.2004 | PT | Erlöschen: 31.08.2004 | SE | Erlöschen: 30.06.2004 | Prüfungsverfahren | 22.12.2003 | Veröffentlichungs-/Druckkostengebühr entrichtet | Entrichtete Gebühren | Jahresgebühr | 02.01.2001 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03 | 02.01.2002 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04 | 02.01.2003 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05 | 02.01.2004 | Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06 | Europäisches Patent erteilt | 31.03.2004 | Einspruchsverfahren | 21.05.2007 | Absendung der Mitteilung über den Widerruf des Patents | | INPADOC-Daten Tooltip | Das EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden. | Datum des Ereignisses: | 18.12.2002 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20021104 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.05.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SPIRIG PHARMA AG | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.03.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.03.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | LT PAYMENT 19991230;LV PAYMENT 19991230;RO PAYMENT 19991230 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.03.2000 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19991230 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | LT LV RO | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 06.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59811094 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20040506 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 05.05.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | GERMAN | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.06.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 27.09.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.09.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.10.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 09.02.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | HENKEL KGAA | Effective DATE: | 20041220 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.02.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | HENKEL KGAA | Effective DATE: | 20041220 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.02.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BEIERSDORF AG | Effective DATE: | 20041224 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2219863 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *SPIRIG PHARMA A.G. | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 17.10.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20070329 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 15.10.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 02.01.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040831 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041216 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041216 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.03.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.06.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 21.12.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20061221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 29.12.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20061229 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 20.12.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20061220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2006 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20061231 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 30.04.2008 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20061229 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *SPIRIG PHARMA A.G. | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.02.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.01.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 08.08.2003 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 13.05.1999 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.09.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 14.09.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 16.05.2007 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 11.08.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 07.06.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 01.02.2005 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 31.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Datum des Ereignisses: | 24.12.2004 | | Beschreibung des Ereignisses: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |