EP1034897 - Essentially parallelepipedal container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Zarges GmbH & Co. KG Zargesstrasse 7 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2001/28] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states ZARGES Leichtbau GmbH Zargesstrasse 7 D-82362 Weilheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pecher, Heinz Fasanenweg 10 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100123.9 | 05.01.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999204057U | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29904057 U | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034897 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034897 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/02 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
B25H3/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/37] | Title | German: | Im wesentlichen quaderförmiger Behälter | [2000/37] | English: | Essentially parallelepipedal container | [2000/37] | French: | Récipient sensiblement parallélépipédique | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0668129 (IND TAYG S L [ES]) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 7,11; | [YA]EP0765819 (DART IND INC [US]) [Y] 1-6,11 * column 4, lines 29-34 * * column 5, lines 6-14; figure - * [A] 13; | [YA]US5680932 (DICKINSON THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,11 * figure - * [A] 7; | [A]FR2720796 (DINZL ORDNUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US2501879 (SULENTIC RAYMOND D) [A] 1,7 * figure - *; | [DA]US5547098 (JORDAN RAYMOND L [US]) [DA] 6,10,11 * figure - *; | [A]US3117692 (CARPENTER ROBERT L, et al) [A] 12 * figures 1,4 * |