EP1022625 - Hologram transfer film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [2017/26] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shioda, Satoshi, @Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 02 /
Hojo, Mikiko, @Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 03 /
Otaki, Hiroyuki, @Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Kenji, @Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 05 /
Toshine, Tetsuya, @Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [2017/26] |
Former [2000/30] | 01 /
Shioda, Satoshi, Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Hojo, Mikiko, Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Otaki, Hiroyuki, Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Ueda, Kenji, Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | |||
05 /
Toshine, Tetsuya, Dai Nippon Printing Co.Ltd. 1-1,Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2000/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100238.5 | 18.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990010475 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1047599 | JP19990010476 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1047699 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022625 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022625 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/02 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G03H1/0252 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H2240/50 (EP,US);
G03H2250/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | G03H1/02, B42D15/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/26] |
Former [2001/15] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übertragungsfolie für Hologramme | [2000/30] | English: | Hologram transfer film | [2000/30] | French: | Film de transfert pour hologrammes | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010585.7 / EP2309339 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2002 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0466118 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1-4,14-16 * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 25 * * figures 1A-C; claims 9-11,20 *; | [A]EP0291928 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 8 * * column 8, line 14 - line 24 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 3 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0869408 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8,10,14-18,20-22 * page 2, line 5 - line 9 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 19 * * page 13, line 55 - page 15, line 20 * | Examination | US5744219 | JP2000010482 | WO9420573 | US5453338 | US5260149 | - W. Driemeier ET AL, "Multiple storage of holograms in blocks of PMMA/MMA/Titanocenechloride", Colloid and Polymer Science ; Kolloid-Zeitschrift und Zeitschrift für Polymere, Berlin, DE, (19861231), vol. 264, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF01410320, ISSN 1435-1536, pages 1024 - 1029, XP055252342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01410320 |