EP1116721 - Process for the reduction of pterines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerbios-Pharma S.A. Via Pian Scairolo 6 CH-6917 Barbengo / CH | [2001/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toderi, Nando Via Lugano 6982 Agno / CH | 02 /
Marazza, Fabrizio, Dr. Rombosco 6986 Novaggio / CH | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink, Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | Application number, filing date | 00100504.0 | 12.01.2000 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116721 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116721 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D475/04 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C07D475/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion von Pterinen | [2001/29] | English: | Process for the reduction of pterines | [2001/29] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction de ptérines | [2003/09] |
Former [2001/29] | Procédé de la réduction de ptérines | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 10.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2003 | [2007/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2807393 (BIORESEARCH SAS) [A] 1,9 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [D]CH635344 (BIORESEARCH SAS [IT]); | [A]EP0179654 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1,9* examples 1-4 *; | [AD]EP0608002 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB]) [AD] 1,9 * Beispiel 1 (i) *; | [AD] - TEMPLE C ET AL, "PREPARATION AND PURIFICATION OF L-(PLUS OR MINUS)-5-FORMYL-5,6,7,8-TETRAHYDROFOLIC ACID", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (19790601), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 731 - 734, XP002074295 [AD] 1,9 * Seite 732, rechte Spalte, letzter Absatz bis Seite 733, linke Spalte, Zeile 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00192a021 |