EP1020609 - Glazing bead and associated frame member for a door, window or fixed glazing or filling panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1-15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanke, Carsten Bremer Strasse 58 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Loesenbeck, Stracke, Loesenbeck, Patentanwälte, Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100547.9 | 12.01.2000 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | DE1999200779U | 18.01.1999 Original published format: DE 29900779 U | [2000/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020609 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020609 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/58, E06B5/11 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
E06B5/116 (EP);
E06B3/5807 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL | Title | German: | Halteleiste und zugeordnetes Rahmenprofil für eine Fenster-, Tür- oder Festverglasung oder für eine Füllungsplatte | [2000/29] | English: | Glazing bead and associated frame member for a door, window or fixed glazing or filling panel | [2000/29] | French: | Parclose et profilé d'encadrement associé pour un vitrage de porte ou fenêtre ou fixe ou pour un panneau de remplissage | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | IT | 12.10.2005 | PT | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1969995 (THOMA VALENTINE L) [X] 1,4,5,12 * page 1, line 36 - line 94; figure - * [Y] 3,7; | [XY]US1981193 (PLYM FRANCIS J) [X] 1 * page 2, line 31 - line 69; figure - * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2602528 (WALTER HALLAUER) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * column W * [Y] 6; | [A]NL274503 (ESA-ALLUMINIO) [A] 2,3,7* page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE1939761 (ZWAAN ADRIANUS J) [X] 1,12 * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 4, paragraph L; figure - * [Y] 3,7 |