EP1020706 - Laser apparatus and gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahiro, Numai Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100856.4 | 17.01.2000 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | JP19990009812 | 18.01.1999 Original published format: JP 981299 | JP19990011100 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1110099 | JP19990034826 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3482699 | JP19990108338 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10833899 | JP20000003895 | 12.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000003895 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020706 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020706 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/66 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G01C19/66 (EP,US);
G01C19/58 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Laservorrichtung und Kreisel | [2000/29] | English: | Laser apparatus and gyroscope | [2000/29] | French: | Appareil laser et gyroscope | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
IT | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3879130 (GREENSTEIN HOWARD B) [X] 1,2,15,25 * column 6, line 24 - column 9, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2017392 (RAYTHEON CO) [X] 1,2,15 * page 2, line 6 - page 5, line 45; figures 1-8 *; | [XY]US4229106 (DORSCHNER TERRY A, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-4 * * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 57 * [Y] 3,4,6-10,13-18,21,22,24,25,28-30; | [XY]US4429997 (MATTHEWS JAMES B [US]) [X] 1,2,5,19,20,23,26,27,38-40 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 30 * * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-8 * [Y] 3,4,6-10,13-18,21,22,24,25,28-30; | [X]US4718766 (GREENSTEIN HOWARD B [US]) [X] 1,2,15* column 4, line 54 - column 9, line 39; figures 1-10 * |