EP1022867 - System of inclined eccentric geosynchronous orbiting satellites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cellier, Alfred 3362 Crownview Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101028.9 | 20.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19990235112 | 21.01.1999 Original published format: US 235112 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022867 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022867 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022867 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/195, H04B7/19 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H04B7/195 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | H04B7/195 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung mit Satelliten auf geneigter, exzentrischer geosynchroner Umlaufbahn | [2006/38] | English: | System of inclined eccentric geosynchronous orbiting satellites | [2000/30] | French: | Système utilisant des satellites ayant des orbites inclinées excentrées geosynchrones | [2000/30] |
Former [2000/30] | Anordnung mit Satelliten auf einer nicht zentrierter geosynchronen Bahn | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4502051 (DONDL PETER [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0886392 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 17 - column 9, line 29; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP0836290 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-6B *; | [X]GB2313743 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-5; claims 1-29 *; | [X]EP0017597 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 2 - line 37; figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO9529538 (STANFORD TELECOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-11; claim 1 *; | [X]US3836969 (BOND D, et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-9; claim 1 * | Examination | EP0387447 | US4943808 | EP0959573 | other | US4943808 | EP0959573 | EP0880240 | US4809935 | US6223019 | - MARAL G., BOUSQUET M., SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS. SYSTEMS, TECHNIQUES AND TECHNOLOGY, CHICHESTER, UK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 248 - 260, ISBN 0-471-93032-6, XP002176175 | - STUART J R; SMITH D J, "Review of ESA Archimedes study 1", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON HIGHLY ELLIPTICAL ORBIT SATELLITE SYSTEMS, (19890524), pages 2/1 - 2/4, XP006525459 |