blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1026014

EP1026014 - An apparatus for filling tyres and method for sealing and filling of leaking vehicle tyres [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Gentner, Hariolf, Dr.
Zennerstrasse 4
81379 München / DE
[2000/32]
Application number, filing date00101052.920.01.2000
[2000/32]
Priority number, dateDE199910407802.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19904078
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1026014
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1026014
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60C23/00, B60C29/06, B60C23/16
[2003/24]
CPC:
B60C29/064 (EP); B29C73/166 (EP); B60C29/062 (EP);
B29L2030/00 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/32]B60C23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Befüllen von Fahrzeugreifen und Verfahren zum Abdichten und Befüllen von undichten Fahrzeugreifen[2000/32]
English:An apparatus for filling tyres and method for sealing and filling of leaking vehicle tyres[2000/32]
French:Dispositif pour remplir des pneumatiques et procédé pour rendre étanches et pour remplir des pneus non-étanches de véhicule[2000/32]
Examination procedure23.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE19827564  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PX] 1-5 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US4969493  (LEE TZAL-LIN [TW]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 23; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2750071  (RITCHIE DAVID P) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 4 - line 32; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19545935  (SP REIFENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 8 - line 41 * * figure -; claims 12-23 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.