EP1022570 - Failsafe monitoring system for potentiometers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juntunen, Robert D. 5767 Vine Hill Road Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | 02 /
Bartels, James I. 1704 Pheasant Run Hudson, Wi 54016 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/50] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | Sturm, Christoph Honeywell Holding AG, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101062.8 | 20.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19990235176 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: US 235176 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022570 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022570 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022570 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, G01R27/14 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G01R31/2829 (EP,US);
G01R27/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2003/42] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausfallsicheres Überwachungssystem für ein Potentiometer | [2000/30] | English: | Failsafe monitoring system for potentiometers | [2000/30] | French: | Système de surveillance à sureté intégrée pour potentiomètres | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, FR, IT | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.12.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4322472 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,15-18,25 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 * [Y] 19-21; | [X]EP0759558 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,15-17 * abstract *; | [X]FR2735871 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 15,17 * abstract *; | [A]EP0354269 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3918695 (DIGI-TABLE THIELEN GMBH & CO KG) [X] 15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0308840 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 18 * column 7, line 1 - line 19; figures 2,3 * [Y] 19,20,22-24; | [Y]DE3522775 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 21-24 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 28; figure 1 * |