EP1120981 - Communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt & Bachmann GmbH Breite Strasse 132 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH Breite Strasse 132 D-41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Norbert Dr. Kampsheide 32 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Markus Dipl. Ing. Lavendelweg 24 52477 Alsdorf / DE | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101353.1 | 24.01.2000 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120981 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120981 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04M11/02 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72502 (EP,US);
H04M1/72513 (EP,US);
H04M1/737 (EP,US);
H04M1/6041 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [2002/17] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem | [2001/31] | English: | Communication system | [2001/31] | French: | Système de communication | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT, SE | 06.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.03.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4882770 (MIYAHIRA RONALD T [US], et al) [Y] 5-8* abstract *; | [XY]EP0665655 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 5, lines 5-23 * [Y] 5-8; | [X]EP0821502 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * page 3, lines 27,28 *; | [XY]WO9858510 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 5 * * page 13, lines 15-31 * [Y] 5-8 |