blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1120756

EP1120756 - Mechanism for product delivered in automatic vending machines and tamper-resistant vending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2007/07]
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / San Martin, Jesus
Ronda Canigo 12-6
08950 Esplugues De Llobregat, Barcelona / ES
02 / Lamsfus, Guillermo
Urbanización Santa Bárbara, 23 V
46111 Rocafort, Valencia / ES
03 / Domenech Sendra, Eduardo
Plaza del Reyno No 6 Pta 12
46600 Alzira, Valencia / ES
 [2007/07]
Former [2001/31]01 / San Martin, Jesus
Ronda Canigo 12-6
08950 Esplugues De Llobregat, Barcelona / ES
02 / Lamsfus, Guillermo
Urbanizacion Santa Barbara,23 V
46111 Rocafort, Valencia / ES
03 / Domenech Sendra, Eduardo
Plaza del Reyno No 6 Pta 12
46600 Alzira, Valencia / ES
Representative(s)Elleby, Gudrun, et al
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2006/51]Elleby, Gudrun, et al
Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé, 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2001/31]Archambault, Jean, et al
55, avenue Nestlé
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date00101747.428.01.2000
[2001/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1120756
Date:01.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1120756
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:G07F11/16
[2001/31]
CPC:
G07F11/10 (EP); G07F11/163 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/31]
TitleGerman:Mechanismus zur Ausgabe von Produkten aus Verkaufsautomaten und betrugssicherer Verkaufsautomat[2001/31]
English:Mechanism for product delivered in automatic vending machines and tamper-resistant vending machine[2001/31]
French:Mécanisme pour produit délivré par une machine de vente et machine de vente résistante aux manipulations[2001/31]
Examination procedure01.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
19.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2006Fee for grant paid
29.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.02.2007
BE14.02.2007
CY14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
[2009/33]
Former [2008/19]AT14.02.2007
BE14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT14.02.2007
BE14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
NL14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
Former [2007/40]NL14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
Former [2007/38]SE14.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0358192  (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5377808  (BAER SCOTT D [US], et al) [Y] 4,6,7 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10 *;
 [A]US5385265  (SCHLAMP HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2730840  (JC DECAUX [FR]) [A] 1,5,9-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5799822  (RUDEWICZ PAUL T [US], et al);
 [XAY]WO9919849  (GROSS GIVEN MFG CO [US]) [X] 1,5,9-12 * page 4, line 25 - line 34 * * page 23, line 25 - page 24, line 34 * * page 31, line 5 - line 12; figures 1-3,9,10,14,15 * [A] 2,3,8 [Y] 4,6,7
by applicantWO9954852
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.