EP1034762 - Packaging wrapper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhtamaki Forchheim Zweigniederlassung der Huhtamaki Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Zweibrückenstrasse 15 - 25 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states 4P Folie Forchheim GmbH Zweibrückenstrasse 15-25 91301 Forchheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Werner Stockweg 6 96129 Strullendorf / DE | 02 /
Ihde, Thomas Heinrich-Soldan-Strasse 16 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Schloss 89296 Osterberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101836.5 | 29.01.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999109839 | 06.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909839 | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034762 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034762 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/551, A61F15/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A61F13/551 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Extension states | SI | 01.08.2002 | Title | German: | Verpackungshülle | [2000/37] | English: | Packaging wrapper | [2000/37] | French: | Enveloppe d'emballage | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1493512 (ETHYL CORP) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 14 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]EP0562448 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,2* column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 53; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0652102 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 2, line 23 - line 26 * * page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 18 * * page 4, line 52 - page 6, line 8; claim - *; | [X]GB2298627 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * page 24, line 21 - page 25, line 22; figure - * |