EP1122799 - Stainless steel substrate for superconducting films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European High Temperature Superconductors GmbH & Co. KG Ehrichstrasse 10 63450 Hanau / DE | For all designated states Alcatel Kabel AG & Co. Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states European High Temperature Superconductors GmbH & Co.KG Ehrichstrasse 10 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
For all designated states Alcatel Kabel AG & Co. Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Zentrum für Funktionswerkstoffe, Gemeinnützige Gesellschaft mbH Windausweg 2 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
For all designated states Alcatel Kabel AG & Co. Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usoskin, Dr. Alexander Ludwig-Beck-Str. 17 37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Freyhardt, Prof. Dr. Herbert Steinbreite 5B 37085 Göttingen / DE | 03 /
Harten, Friedrich Landsbergerstr. 5c 315266 Stadthagen / DE | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101932.2 | 01.02.2000 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122799 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
H10N60/0521 (EP,US);
H10N60/0576 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Title | German: | Substrat aus rostfreiem Stahl für Supraleiterschichten | [2001/32] | English: | Stainless steel substrate for superconducting films | [2001/32] | French: | Substrat en acier inoxydable pour films supraconducteurs | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0578124 ; | [X]EP0312015 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0441724 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [X]EP0447198 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | JPH0578124 [ ] (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); |