Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1143532 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2007 | B1 | EP1143532 | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | EP01101797 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5167445B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | B2 | JP2001266666 | 28.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1122799 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE382193T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60132039T | 24.12.2008 | T2 | DE60132039D1 | 07.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1143532T | 28.04.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6541121 | 01.04.2003 | B2 | US2002110708 | 15.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00101932 | 01.02.2000 |