EP1004495 - Vehicle braking system and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO AUTOMOTIVE U.K. LIMITED Beacon Works, Texas Street Morley Leeds, LS27 0HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states WABCO AUTOMOTIVE U.K. LIMITED Beacon Works, Texas Street Morley, Leeds, LS27 0HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Andrew Howard 24 Oakfield Road Birkby, Huddersfield, HD2 2XF / GB | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00101998.3 | 23.04.1998 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | GB19970008170 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9708170 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004495 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004495 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004495 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/02, F17C5/06, B60T13/26, B60T11/32, G05D16/20 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
B60T13/268 (EP,US);
B60T11/326 (EP,US);
B60T17/02 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugbremssystem und sein Betätigungsverfahren | [2000/22] | English: | Vehicle braking system and method of operation thereof | [2000/22] | French: | Système de freinage pour véhicule et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98917451.1 / EP0977682 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19515895 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0463329 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [PA]US5678900 (BLANZ ROLAND [DE]) [PA] 1,6 * abstract *; | [PA]DE19632754 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,6 * abstract * |