EP1034971 - Motor vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Bernd Hohnerstrasse 17 72218 Wildberg / DE | 02 /
Schrom, Ralf-Henning Kelterstrasse 13 72108 Rottenburg / DE | 03 /
Schulz, Volkmar Schlagleite 8 a 96479 Weitransdorf / DE | [2000/37] | Application number, filing date | 00102037.9 | 02.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999110086 | 08.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910086 | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034971 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034971 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/42 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
B60N2/072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | B60N2/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugsitz | [2000/37] | English: | Motor vehicle seat | [2000/37] | French: | Siège de véhicule automobile | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 03.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3144218 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 8; figures 4-7 * [A] 4-7,9-11; | [XA]EP0470413 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 39; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 3; | [A]DE19709314 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE7932187U | EP0046227 | DE4102353 |