Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1029568
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.01.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
01.10.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.03.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
07.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
09.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.03.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
09.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
12.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.07.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |