Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000237447 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2000 | A | JP3027829B | 04.04.2000 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4240699 | 19.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1029568 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2004 | A3 | EP1029568 | 23.08.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4240699 | 19.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6402619 | 11.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4240699 | 19.02.1999 |