EP1031627 - Protein having enzymatic activity in the cleavage of beta-carotene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/35] | Beta-carotene 15,15'-dioxygenase | ||
[2005/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Heinrich Hauptstrasse 42 4451 Wintersingen / CH | 02 /
Brugger, Roland Egonstrasse 21 79106 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Friedlein, Arno Martin Dornröschenweg 10 79189 Bad Krozingen / DE | 04 /
Wirtz, Gabriele Margarethe Roehnstrasse 19 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Woggon, Wolf-Dietrich Dorenbachstrasse 89 4102 Binningen / CH | 06 /
Wyss, Adrian Förenstrasse 9 4313 Möhlin / CH | 07 /
Wyss, Markus Rotackerstrasse 9 4410 Liestal / CH | [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
Bachmann, Heinrich Hauptstrasse 42 4451 Wintersingen / CH | ||
02 /
Brugger, Roland Egonstr. 21 79106 Freiburg / DE | |||
03 /
Friedlein, Arno Martin Dornröschenweg 10 79189 Bad Krozingen / DE | |||
04 /
Wirtz, Gabriele Margarethe Roehnstrasse 19 42349 Wuppertal / DE | |||
05 /
Woggon, Wolf-Dietrich Dorenbachstrasse 89 4102 Binningen / CH | |||
06 /
Wyss, Adrian Förenstrasse 9 4313 Möhlin / CH | |||
07 /
Wyss, Markus Rotackerstrasse 9 4419 Liestal / CH | Representative(s) | Schwander, Kuno DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Patent Department VMD Bau 241 / 636 P.O. Box 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Schwander, Kuno Josef, Dr. DSM Nutritional Products AG Patent Department VMD Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2004/52] | Schwander, Kuno DSM Nutritional Products Ltd. Patent Department VMD Bau 241 / 636 P.O. Box 3255 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/23] | Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/35] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102289.6 | 17.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | EP19990103382 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: EP 99103382 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031627 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031627 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N9/02, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12P23/00, C07K16/40, C12Q1/68, G01N33/573, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:19) | [2000/35] | CPC: |
C12N9/0069 (EP,US);
C07K14/00 (KR);
C12P23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | Protein, das die Spaltung von Beta-Carotin katalysiert | [2005/31] | English: | Protein having enzymatic activity in the cleavage of beta-carotene | [2005/31] | French: | Protéine catalysant le clivage de bêta-carotène | [2005/31] |
Former [2000/35] | Beta-karotin 15,15'-dioxygenase | ||
Former [2000/35] | Beta-carotene 15,15'-dioxygenase | ||
Former [2000/35] | Bêta-carotène 15,15'-dioxygenase | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 04.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | BE | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | IE | 17.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | LU | 18.03.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 17.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 17.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 17.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 17.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 17.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9323538 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [A] 1* page 21 - page 24 *; | [DA] - DEVERY J ET AL, "Beta-carotene-15,15'-dioxygenase (EC 1.13.11.21) isolation reaction method and an improved assay procedure.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION., CAMBRIDGE., GB, (199409), vol. 72, no. 3, pages 397 - 414, XP000914668 [DA] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/BJN19940042 | Examination | - SHARMA R.V. ET AL, "Studies on the metabolism of beta carotene and apo beta carotenoids in rats and chickens", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1977), vol. 486, no. 1, pages 183 - 194 | - SKLAN D., "Carotene-cleavage activity in chick intestinal mucosa cytosol: association with a high-moleuclar-weight lipid-protein aggregate fraction and partial characterization of the activity", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1983), vol. 50, pages 417 - 425 | - WYSS A. ET AL, "Cloning and expression of beta,beta-carotene 15,15'-dioxygenase", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2000), vol. 271, pages 334 - 336 |