EP1036936 - Monitoring system for starter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Steffen An der Steinernen Brücke 6 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [2000/38] | Application number, filing date | 00102370.4 | 04.02.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | DE1999110330 | 09.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910330 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036936 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036936 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/04, F02N11/10 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F02N11/105 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F02N11/0866 (EP,US);
F02N2011/0885 (EP,US);
F02N2011/0888 (EP,US);
F02N2011/0896 (EP,US);
F02N2300/302 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/23] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung einer Starteinrichtung | [2001/44] | English: | Monitoring system for starter device | [2000/38] | French: | Système de surveillance pour dispositif de démarrage | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/38] | Vorrichtung zur überwachung einer Starteinrichtung | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 04.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0942005 ; | [DA]WO9415808 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB], et al); | [A]DE19532163 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09042005 A 19970210 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [DA] * abstract * |