EP1031831 - Device and method for testing genuineness of noble metal shaped bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMG AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henning, Carsten, Dr. Darmstädter Landstrasse 121 60598 Frankfurt/M. / DE | 02 /
Barbehön, Jörg, Dr. Grüner Weg 26 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Marquis, Heinz Echzeller Strasse 12 60388 Frankfurt/M. / DE | 04 /
Herder, Martin Westring 31 63110 Rodgau / DE | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Herrmann, Reinhard OMG AG FI-PAT Postfach 1351 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102376.1 | 04.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999108620 | 27.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19908620 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031831 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/12 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
G01N29/12 (EP);
G01N29/30 (EP);
G01N29/348 (EP,US);
G01N33/20 (EP,US);
G01N2291/015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Echtheitsprüfung von Edelmetallformkörpern | [2000/35] | English: | Device and method for testing genuineness of noble metal shaped bodies | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'authentification des corps moules en metal noble | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0113031 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DY] 1,5 * figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH08138109 ; | [Y]WO9859237 (DYNAMIC RESONANCE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1,5 * page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 18 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08138109 A 19960531 (G T K ENG KK) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * |