EP1028609 - Electronic device with coaxial connectors for high-frequency circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Akinobu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/22] |
Former [2000/33] | 01 /
Suzuki, Akinobu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102459.5 | 04.02.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | JP19990034402 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3440299 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1028609 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1028609 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H05K7/142 (EP,US);
H01R24/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/22] |
Former [2000/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Gerät mit Koaxialstecker für eine Hochfrequenzleiterplatte | [2000/33] | English: | Electronic device with coaxial connectors for high-frequency circuit board | [2000/33] | French: | Appareil électronique comprenant un connecteur coaxial pour plaquette à circuit imprimé haute fréquence | [2007/29] |
Former [2000/33] | Appareil électronique comprenant un connecteur électronique avec un contact central connecté électriquement avec plaquette imprimée | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 02.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [Y] 1 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [Y] 1-5 |