EP1048769 - Process for starting a loom with electromotive main drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindauer Dornier GmbH Rickenbacher Strasse 119 88129 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states LINDAUER DORNIER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H Rickenbacher Strasse 119 88129 Lindau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Arno Grüntenweg 23 88161 Lindenberg / DE | 02 /
Müller, Herbert Nonnenbacherweg 25 88079 Kressbronn / DE | [2000/44] | Application number, filing date | 00102516.2 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | DE1999114131 | 27.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19914131 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1048769 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1048769 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048769 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D03D51/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
D03D51/12 (EP,US);
D03D51/002 (EP,US);
D03D51/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anwerfen von mit einem elektromotorischen Hauptantrieb ausgerüsteten Webmaschinen | [2000/44] | English: | Process for starting a loom with electromotive main drive | [2000/44] | French: | Procédé de mise en marche d'un métier à tisser pourvu d'un entraînement principal à électro-moteur | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2003 | FI | 17.12.2003 | IE | 17.12.2003 | AT | 07.02.2004 | LU | 07.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/36] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
AT | 07.02.2004 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3542650 (STROMAG MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 4, line 29 - line 67; figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [DA]US4837485 (MEROTH KLAUS [DE], et al) [DA] 1-8 * figure 2; claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0406532 (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]BE1003195 (PICANOL NV) [A] 1* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X]US5172732 (KRUMM VALENTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 7, line 8 - line 31; claims 1,6,9 * |