EP1038570 - Positively charged polymer membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 2200 Northern Boulevard East Hills, NY 11548-1209 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Pall Corporation 2200 Northern Boulevard East Hills, NY 11548-1209 / US | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states USF Filtration and Separations Group Inc. 2118 Greenspring Drive Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, I-Fan 13248 Sparren Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Zepf, Robert 227 North Rios Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/39] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00102545.1 | 08.07.1997 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19960021369 | 08.07.1996 Original published format: US 21369 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038570 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038570 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D71/68 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP);
B01D67/0011 (EP,US);
B01D67/0013 (EP,US);
B01D67/0016 (EP,US);
B01D67/0093 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (EP);
B01D71/68 (EP);
B01D71/76 (EP);
B01D2323/30 (EP);
B01D2325/022 (EP,US);
B01D2325/16 (EP);
B01D2325/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | Positiv geladene Polymermembranen | [2000/39] | English: | Positively charged polymer membranes | [2000/39] | French: | Membranes polymère chargée positivement | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97933314.3 / EP0935494 | Divisional application(s) | EP01111754.6 / EP1121972 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | LU | 08.07.2006 | IE | 10.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3808305 (GREGOR H); | [A]US4125462 (LATTY JAMES); | [A]US5269931 (HU HO-PIN [US], et al); | [YD]US5531893 (HU HOPIN [US], et al) |