EP1039069 - Device for attaching a tombstone to a foundation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEHA- LUDWIG WERWEIN GMBH Wikingerstrasse 15 D-86343 Königsbrunn / DE | [2000/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sechser, Christian Lenaustrasse 14 c 86179 Ausburg / DE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/39] | Charrier, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Charrier Rapp & Liebau Postfach 31 02 47 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102561.8 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999205177U | 20.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29905177 U | DE1999209396U | 31.05.1999 Original published format: DE 29909396 U | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039069 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039069 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04H13/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
E04H13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum befestigen eines Grabsteins an einem Fundament | [2000/39] | English: | Device for attaching a tombstone to a foundation | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'une pierre tombale à une fondation | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE29902700U (FRANK HEINRICH [DE]) [PX] 1-3,8 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0226178 (FRANK HEINRICH GOTTFRIED WILHE) [A] 1-3 * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]AT380058B (AUFHAUSER FRANZ ING [AT]) [A] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19546278 (FRANK JUERGEN LEONHARD [DE]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]DE8707646U (H. FRANK) [A] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5; figure - * |