EP1034765 - Device for facilitating the entry and exit of a vehicle of the public transport, especially a vehicle riding along a platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Bode GmbH & Co. KG Ochshäuser Strasse 14 34123 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Gebrüder Bode GmbH & Co.KG Ochshäuser Strasse 14 34123 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilcher, Dietmar Kieler Strasse 29 34246 Vellmar-West / DE | 02 /
Hielscher, Matthias Günsterbergstrasse 2 37235 Hess.-Lichtenau / DE | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102673.1 | 09.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999109700 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909700 | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034765 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034765 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/06, B60P1/43, B60R3/02 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A61G3/061 (EP);
A61G3/067 (EP);
B60R3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erleichterung des Ein- und Aussteigens an einem Fahrzeug des öffentlichen Personenverkehrs, insbesondere einem Bahnsteige anfahrenden Fahrzeug | [2000/37] | English: | Device for facilitating the entry and exit of a vehicle of the public transport, especially a vehicle riding along a platform | [2000/37] | French: | Dispositif pour faciliter l'entrée et la sortie d'un véhicule des transports publics en particulier un véhicule approchant un perron | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/34] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5636399 (TREMBLAY JULES M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * column 5, line 51 - line 65 * * column 6, line 56 - line 61; figure - * [A] 5,10 [Y] 7; | [DY]EP0217265 (ALSTHOM [FR]) [DY] 7 * page 3, line 22 - line 27; figure - *; | [A]US4662021 (HAGEN JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 2, line 39 - line 42; figure - *; | [A]US5676515 (HAUSTEIN NORMAN E [US]) | by applicant | EP0416539 | EP0217265 |